Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stone, Joyce, Stone, Terry, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Volvovic, Joshua Luke, against The Phillips Group Inc, represented by Lee, Richard A., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Derek J. Vanderwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDerek J. Vanderwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreement STIPULATED CR2A |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment AMENDED |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.