Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Reach Community Development Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Adegbite, Lindsey Ann, against Kindblade, Benita, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Derek J. Vanderwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDerek J. Vanderwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2022 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Writ | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Posting | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Writ of Restitution | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer
Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Posting | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.