Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Navigators Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Juhl, Nicholas William, against D&D Custom Homes Llc, Tolmachev, Daniel, Tolmachev, Jane Doe, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Suzan L. Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzan L. Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Clark, Suzan L |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support OF MEGAN KELLY |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration of Sum Certain | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment *AMENDED* |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment *WRNG DATE*ATTY NOTIFIED* |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment *12-16-22 DPT 8 DCKT CNCLLED*ATTY NOTIFIED* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.