Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wesco Distribution Inc.,, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Finkelstein, Fred Stephen, against Nationwide Energy, Inc.,, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.