Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fogg, Edward, Fogg, Maria, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Nellor, John David, against Quality Loan Service Corp. Of Washington, Selene Finance, Lp, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, represented by Hensrude, Gregor, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Robert A. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Trust Fund Disbursed | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Lewis, Robert A |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Trust Received - Tender | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial EST 2 DAYS Judge: Lewis, Robert A |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Trust Received - Tender | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Trust Received - Tender | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Trust Received - Tender |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.