Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lloyd, Jonathan, Nilluka, Jennifer, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Griffin, Tyson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Snider, Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSnider, Jennifer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryCbc Contractor Bond Complaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Snider, Jennifer K |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference MANDATORY SCHDLING CONF - P. Judge: Snider, Jennifer K |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference MANDATORY SCHDLING CONF - P Judge: Snider, Jennifer K |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss -P |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.