Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ramsey, Roland Dale, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pak, James Lee, against D.R Horton, Inc- Portland, Jensen, Jane Doe, Jensen, Scott, Lang, Jane Doe, Lang, Scott, (total of 11) See All represented by Joseph, William R, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Robert A. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Stipulated | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Lewis, Robert A |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine D-Mt to Quash & for Prot Order Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Party WITH PREJUDICE, STIPULATED |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief (P) AMENDED |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support (D) OF MT TO QUASH/ FOR PROT ORDER |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendants Proposed Instructions D.R. HORTON, INC. |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief (P) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.