Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Livingston, Gene, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Eline, Jerome F., Ii, against Somarakis, Inc., represented by Nellor, John David, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing REVIEW/STATUS CONFERENCE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Status Conference Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.