Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gerou, Clifford, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Price, Gregory Earl, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Nako, Mai-Anh Tran, Widney, Allison Mae, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Suzan L. Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzan L. Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice AMEDNED ARBITRATION DATE |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ARBITRATION DATE |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Clark, Suzan L |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment for Arbitration Setting CMPL 08-02-21 NOTICE 11-23-21 |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Arbitrability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.