Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Waverly Homes Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Macgregor, Elizabeth Dianne, against Apex Mason Inc, Gomez-Lazo, Jose A, Gonzales, Lauro Felix, Henco Plumbing Services Llc, Hitchcock, Daniel Jon, (total of 10) See All represented by Conway, Jesse David, Drotz, John E., Engle, Christopher Thomas, Fry, Gregory P, Townsend, Josephine C, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion Petition | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.