Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leibowitz, Nora, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Murphy, Michelle D, Murphy, Michelle Dawn, Murphy'S Masonry & Construction, Llc, Western Surety Co, represented by Duyck, Daniel Leroy, Sheely, Paul Edward, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Suzan L. Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzan L. Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference 9:00 am Judge: Clark, Suzan L |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P- Judge: Clark, Suzan L |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Joint Status Report | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.