Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance As Subrogee Of Fessica L Ribeiro, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Judd, Paul, against C2 Utility Contractors, Llc, represented by Bolster, Justin E, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Stipulated | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment *AMENDED* |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AMENDED |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment *DCKT CNCLD - ATTY NTFD* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.