Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Comapny As Subrogee Of Ledy S. Mercado, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Judd, Paul, against Rpm Towing, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Default GRANTING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT RPM TOWING D/B/A ERIC'S TOWING |
|
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint FOR SUMS DUE TO A SUBROGATED PARTY |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.