Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
And Hawes Properties Llc, Wife And Husband, Vicki R Hawes And Douglas B Hawes, A Married Woman As Her Sole And Separate Property, Hawes, Vicki R, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Davies, Steven William, against And Quality Loan Service Corporation Of Washington, As Trustee For Ramp 2006-Rs3, N.A. As Successor To Jpmorgan Chase Bankn.A, The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, represented by Moore, Ryan Steven, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO RESTRAIN TRUSTEE'S SALE AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO RESTRAIN TRUSTEE'S SALE AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MOTION TO RESTRAIN TRUSTEE'S SALE & FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit JOINT DECLARATION OF VICKI R. HAWES AND DOUGLAS B. HAWES IN SUPPORT OF REPLY |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF HOWARD R. HANDVILLE TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.