Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anthony Dibenedetto, Jr And Susan Dibenedetto, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Irwin, Patrick Mcgettigan, against Christopher Palmer And Shana Palmer, Greentree Communications Company, represented by Bagwell, Kenneth W, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Receipt Certified Mail | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment AMENDED JUDGMENT ON AMENDED ANSWER AND ORDER TO PAY INTO REGISTRY OF THE COURT |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application FOR AMENDED JUDGMENT ON AMENDED ANSWER AND ORDER TO PAY |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other PROOF OF RECEIPT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Against Garnishee Defendant JUDGMENT ON ANSWER & ORDER TO PAY INTO REGISTRY OF THE COURT |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application FOR JUDGMENT ON ANSWER & ORDER TO PAY |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.