Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bodey, Belva J, Bodey, Emmett, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Gamble, Sean, against Boyd, Edward S, Monsanto Company, Pharmicia Llc, Solutia, Inc., Steichen, Monica M, (total of 5) See All represented by Campbell, Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts with W. Brent Basden presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeW. Brent Basden Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2019 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 28DJT |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 28DJT |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 28 DAY JT |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing REGARDING TERMS OF CR 35 EXAMINATIONS |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion DEFT'S MONSANTO COMPANY, SOLUTIA INC. AND PHARMACIA LLC'S MOTION RE TERMS OF CR 35 EXAMINATIONS |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Issue RE MOTION REGARDINT ERMS OF CR 35 EXAMINATIONS |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF LAWRENCE MURPHY |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF ELIZABETH ZIEGLER |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF ALLISON K. KRASHAN |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order STIPULAION AND CONTINUING TRIAL DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.