Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ruth Brothers Enterprises, Llc, A Washington Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case against Jennie'S Meadow Homeowner Association, City Of Sequim A Municipal Corporation Of The State Of Washington, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts with Lauren M. Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLauren M. Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
CategoryLupa Land Use Petition Act |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order FINAL |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Final Order
Judge: Basden, Brent |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Issue | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pending Decision
Judge: Basden, Brent |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.