Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Sacks, Joel, State Of Washington, Department Of Labor And Industries, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Greer, Lucretia Fishburn, against Sequim Ranch Property Management, Llc, represented by Kalzer, Karen Adell, in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts with Lauren M. Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLauren M. Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF KYM BOSTELLE |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Erickson, Lauren M |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENCY OF PROCESS AND FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Opposition DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Note for Calendar CIVIL MOTIONS |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pending Decision
Judge: Erickson, Lauren M |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TELEPHONIC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.