Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aaco A1 Health Services Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Lanza, Eric, against Cornerstone Healthcare Services, Llc, Crestwood Convalescent- Port Angeles Llc, represented by Miller, Craig L., in the jurisdiction of Clallam County, WA, . Clallam County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategoryAbj Abstract Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClallam County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing APPEARANCE FOR EXAMINATION |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing APPEARANCE FOR EXAMINATION COURTROOM 3 |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF DISQUALIFICATION- JUDGE ERICKSON |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance CRAIG MILLER FOR DEF |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.