Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez, Bambi, Martinez, Catalina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brester, Christopher J, against Cappa, Robert, Irrigation Technology And Control Inc, represented by Bernadt, W. Bradford, Wieder, Melinda Hall, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.