Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brashem, Annie, Brashem, Kevin, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kane, Corey Michael, against Central Washington Health Services Association, Confluence Health, Kittleston, Denise, Methow Valley Clinic, Tuggy, Michael, (total of 5) See All represented by Moore, Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Travis C. Brandt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTravis C. Brandt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Dismissal
Judge: Brandt, Travis C |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default
Judge: Brandt, Tracy S |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.