Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Custom Orchards Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Monahan, Brendan V, against Creekside Nursery Llc, represented by Anders, Scott St. Clair, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Kristin Ferrara presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKristin Ferrara Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice STIPULATION |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings STIPULATIN AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing PAST DATE |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition TO DISMISS |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Ferrera, Kristin M |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Stipulated | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Hearing | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings DENYING MT TO DISMISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.