Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Allender, David W, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Country Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Harwood, Patrick W, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy S. Brandt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracy S. Brandt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Dismissal
Judge: Brandt, Tracy S |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.