Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
North Cascades Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Walker, Brian A, against England, Leonard Carl, Len England Orchard Inc, represented by O'Rourke, Daniel Perry, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Dismissal
Judge: Ferrera, Kristin M |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Jourdan, Robert E |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum IN SUPPORT |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit BRIAN WALKER |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit JOSHUA STENDERA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.