Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chelan County, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Sealby, Robert William, against Bremmer, Margaret, Davy Enterprises, Llc, Davy, Lisa, Davy, Martin, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment STIPULATED |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.