Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mendivil, Luis Adan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pleas, Patrick Michael, against American Contractors Indemnity Company, Elite Wolf Pack Construction, Mendez, Diego, represented by Hansen, William Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts with Travis C. Brandt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTravis C. Brandt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryCbc Contractor Bond Complaint |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Accounting PLAINTIFF'S ACCOUNTING OF PARTIAL COLLECTION OF JUDGMENTS |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Authorizing EXONERATION & DISBURSE BOND, RESERVE RIGHTS, DISMISS SURETY |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Default | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment THE ELITE WOLF PACK CONSTRUCTION |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Brandt, Travis C |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.