Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Hood, Kimberly M., against Portfolio Recovery Associates, in the jurisdiction of Chelan County, WA, . Chelan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChelan County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit LINDA BROWN |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment AMENDED |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.