Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Greaves, Melissa Roberta, against Diaz, Rafael V, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Brown, Bronson J |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Joseph C. Guenther |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.