Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rigueiro, Isabel, Roque Rigueiro, Rildenia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hopkins, Jane Doe, Hopkins, Patrik E, represented by Bendele, Levi Lewis, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Howell, Andrew |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.