Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The Sherwin-Williams Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Siderius, Frank Raymond, against Angeles, Rene Gaona, Navigators Insurance Company, R Quality Construction Llc, represented by Dishaw, Meredith Eileen, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Samuel P. Swanberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel P. Swanberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Party Dft Rene Gaona Angeles |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit re Signatures |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds and Dismissal of Navigators Insurance |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment as to Def R Quality Construction Only |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Nikke L Grisso |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment and Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.