Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Schell, Janice, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Riley, Benjamin J, against Cincinnati Ins Co., Fmr General Contractor Llc, Ohio Security Ins Co., Valle, Maria, Western Surety Co., (total of 5) See All represented by Goldman, Eden Esther, Hammond, Jonathan, Harrison, Frank Stuart, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Jacqueline Stam presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacqueline Stam Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2021 |
CategoryCbc Contractor Bond Complaint |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Digital/RXM/D Judge: Stam, Jacqueline I |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 4 DAYS |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Digital/JMP/C Judge: Whitmire, Megan |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Re Trial Priority |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing Trial Priority Judge: Whitmire, Megan |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice for Trial Setting | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Whitmire, Megan |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on PreTrial Conference | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing
Judge: Brown, Bronson J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.