Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Connor, Michael, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Quillen, William Michael, Esq, against Northwest Coating And Paint, Urbina, Juana, represented by Floerchinger, Dean, Hansen, David B., in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Samuel P. Swanberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel P. Swanberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Time TBD |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Time TBD |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Brown, Bronson J |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Amending Case Schedule
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.