Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brennan, Carrie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Davidson, Michael John, against Richland Sky Apartments, Llc, Ricnland Sky Apartments, Llc, represented by Repass, Timothy John, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Carrie L. Runge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarrie L. Runge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Length TBD |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Management Hearing Time TBD |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Time TBD Judge: Whitmire, Megan |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Return to Active Status | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Ekstrom, Alexander Carl |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Arbitration Hearing |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Arbitrability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.