Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Schein, Henry, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kelly, Benjamin E, against On Scene Medical Services Pc, in the jurisdiction of Benton County, WA, . Benton County, WA Superior Courts with Joseph M. Burrowes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Burrowes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBenton County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Burrowes, Joseph M |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment on Answer of Garnishee |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Dec of Garnishment |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Digital/AAM/E Judge: Ekstrom, Alexander Carl |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Proceeding COM/Order for Suplemental Proceeding Judge: Ekstrom, Alexander Carl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.