Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Buchholz, Karen, Buchholz, Eugene, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rembert, Robert W, against Tri-State Memorial Hospital, Flinders, Jane Doe, Flinders, Craig, represented by Lamberson, Stephen Maurice, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2020 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MARIE DUMAN |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INTENT TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF CRAIG FLINDERS |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF INTENT TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MARIE DUMAN |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition TO SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision AND ORDER RE: REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION PER CR36 |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Scheduling | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM JUDGE LIBEY OF ORDER RE DISCOVERY MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.