Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Karmazinas, Beth I., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Dukes, Lucille Lenore, against Developers Surety & Indemnity Co.,, West Tech Industries, Llc, A.J. Kasper, represented by Guin, John Henry, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order AND STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT FEES OR COSTS |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial
Judge: Fearing, George B |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice /TRIAL AMENDEMENT PURSUANT TO CR 15(b) |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DOCUMENTS OFFERED UNDER EVIDENCE RULE 904 |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF LUCY DUKES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.