Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Peola Farms, Inc., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Kovarik, Nicholas D, against King-Fitzgerald, Llc, represented by Fulgham, Mischelle R., in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Scott D. Gallina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott D. Gallina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2017 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Release OF GARNISHMENT |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law AWARD OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision After Trial | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.