Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bobenhouse, Katya, Bobenhouse, Phillip, Jr, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case against Asotin County Sheriff'S Department, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Tina L. Kernan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTina L. Kernan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2017 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion AND ORDER EXONERATING BOND |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM THE SUPREME COURT |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM THE SUPREME COURT |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COURT OF APPEALS |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter TRANSMITTAL LETTER - SUPREME COURT |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Findings of Indigency | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER OF INDIGENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.