Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Herco Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ledgerwood, Thomas L., against Beierle, Virginia, Cooley, Jay, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts with Scott D. Gallina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott D. Gallina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2016 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default FORECLOSURE Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of NonMilitary Service | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration FOR ORDER OF DEFAULT |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons ON AMENDED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE LIEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.