Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Polillo, Jeffrey, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Burns, Brooke Jennifer, against Asotin County Sheriff'S Department, in the jurisdiction of Asotin County, WA, . Asotin County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2016 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAsotin County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order MOTION AND ORDER EXONERATING BOND |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes -: COURT HEARING MINUTES; |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order 8: RESTRAINING ORDER AND SHOW CAUSE; |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
CD Record of Proceedings -: CD RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS - SUP; |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -: MOTION HEARING; |
|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
LT Law and Motion Docket, Trial Settings SHOW CAUSE 9AM |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response 7: RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CASUE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.