We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Washington Vs Juan Flores Et Wx

Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago

filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Flores, J Doe, Flores, Juan J, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts .

Case Details for v. Flores, J Doe , et al.

Filing Date

January 29, 2018

Category

Tax Warrants

Last Refreshed

November 28, 2023

Practice Area

Tax

Filing Location

Adams County, WA

Matter Type

General Tax

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties for v. Flores, J Doe , et al.

Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Flores, J Doe

Flores, Juan J

Case Events for v. Flores, J Doe , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Satisfaction
Docket Event Warrant for OverPaid Benefits Employment Security
1: WARRANT OVERPAID BENEFITS EMPLY SEC; WARRANT NO. TFHHVC;
Docket Event Case Resolution Transfer of Judgment
See all events

Related Content in Adams County

Case

American Express National Bank vs Karla Lopez
Jul 08, 2024 | COL Collection | 24-2-00097-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of RAFAEL L MARTINEZ and MARIA TERESA MARTINEZ SANCHEZ
Mar 11, 2024 | DIC Dissolution of Marriage with Children | 24-3-00010-01

Case

Aaron Noseret al vs Main Street Development , LLCet al
Jul 05, 2024 | CBC Contractor Bond Complaint | 24-2-00095-01

Case

Sarahjean Artrup vs James Cluff
Mar 07, 2024 | OSC Out-of-State Child Custody | 24-3-00009-01

Case

Department of Labor and Industries vs Tanner G Gilbert
Jul 05, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | TAX L & I Tax Warrant | 24-2-00096-01

Case

Guardianship of Marisol Perez
Mar 25, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | MGC Minor Guardianship Custody | 24-4-00008-01

Case

Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC vs Dennis Swinger, Jr
Jul 05, 2024 | MSC2 Miscellaneous - Civil | 24-2-00094-01

Case

Guardianship of Cassandra L. Gearheart
May 13, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | GDN Guardianship | 24-4-00011-01

Case

Estate of Howard John Huntingford
Apr 10, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | EST Estate | 24-4-00009-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of JACOB ALFONSO HERNANDEZ and KRYSTAL M HOFSTEE-HERNANDEZ
Apr 15, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | DIC Dissolution of Marriage with Children | 24-3-00013-01

Case

Estate of Jack H Peppler
Apr 15, 2024 | EST Estate | 24-4-00010-01

Case

Estate of Alta Fullmer
Mar 04, 2024 | EST Estate | 24-4-00007-01

Case

Cassandra Garcia vs GILBERTO SILVAS
Mar 20, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | PPS Parenting Plan/Child Support | 24-3-00011-01

Document

City Of Lowell v. Figueiredo, Sabino C , et al.
Jun 26, 2024 | Tax Lien | Tax Lien | 24 TL 000437

Document

City of Boston v. Tevolitz, Craig M.
May 24, 2024 | Tax Lien | Tax Lien | 24 TL 000348

Document

WSF Phase III A LLC vs County of Ramsey
Jul 02, 2024 | Open | Tax Court | Tax Court | 62-CV-24-4090

Document

In Re the Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed to:V.
Jul 03, 2024 | TP - Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed | 34C01-2407-TP-002193

Document

STEPHANIE JOHNSON V DEONTE FONDA ET AL (E-CASE)
Jul 09, 2024 | CC Tax Action Other | CC Tax Action Other | 24PE-CC00246

Document

Town of Burlington v. Patel, Uttamlal , et al.
Jun 18, 2024 | Tax Lien | Tax Lien | 24 TL 000411

Document

City of Lynn v. Limcaho, Bulger , et al.
May 14, 2024 | Tax Lien | Tax Lien | 24 TL 000330

Document

LANTRAC COURT LLC VS DEKALB COUNTY TAX ASSESSORS
Jan 11, 2024 | Dear Jackson | Tax Assessor | 24CV1382

Document

FLAKES MILL VENTURES LLC VS DEKALB COUNTY TAX ASSESSORS
May 03, 2024 | Parker-Smith, Yolanda C. | Tax Assessor | 24CV4796

Document

City of Framingham v. Dolaher, Elizabeth , et al.
Jun 25, 2024 | Tax Lien | Tax Lien | 24 TL 000432

Document

HIGHLAND VILLAGE 2014 LLC VS DEKALB COUNTY TAX ASSESSORS
Dec 19, 2023 | Parker-Smith, Yolanda C. | Tax Assessor | 23CV10932

Document

Town Of Littleton v. Harris, Elizabeth A
Jun 20, 2024 | Tax Lien | Tax Lien | 24 TL 000426