We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Washington Vs Blanca N Ruelas

Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago

filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Ruelas, Blanca N, Ruelas, J Doe, in the jurisdiction of Adams County, WA, . Adams County, WA Superior Courts .

Case Details for v. Ruelas, Blanca N , et al.

Filing Date

June 26, 2017

Category

Tax Warrants

Last Refreshed

November 28, 2023

Practice Area

Tax

Filing Location

Adams County, WA

Matter Type

General Tax

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties for v. Ruelas, Blanca N , et al.

Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Ruelas, Blanca N

Ruelas, J Doe

Case Events for v. Ruelas, Blanca N , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Release
of Warrant
Docket Event Warrant for OverPaid Benefits Employment Security
1: WARRANT OVERPAID BENEFITS EMPLY SEC; WARRANT NO. V3HSF7;
Docket Event Case Resolution Transfer of Judgment
See all events

Related Content in Adams County

Case

In Re the Marriage of Andres Cortes Mendez and Fabiola Esquivel Pasillas
Jul 03, 2024 | DIN Dissolution of Marriage with No Children | 24-3-00026-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of IRMA AMBROCIO GONZALEZ and Sergio Martinez Sanchez
Apr 01, 2024 | DIC Dissolution of Marriage with Children | 24-3-00012-01

Case

Guardianship of Ryan Anthony Bardin
May 13, 2024 | GDN Guardianship | 24-4-00012-01

Case

LORIN SAMUEL SUMNER vs DIANNA MARGARET VAN ANDEL
Jul 09, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | CPO Civil Protection Order | 24-2-00098-01

Case

Estate of Howard John Huntingford
Apr 10, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | EST Estate | 24-4-00009-01

Case

Estate of Charles John Schmidt
Jun 26, 2024 | EST Estate | 24-4-00014-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of RAFAEL L MARTINEZ and MARIA TERESA MARTINEZ SANCHEZ
Mar 11, 2024 | DIC Dissolution of Marriage with Children | 24-3-00010-01

Case

MARIA I VILLANUEVA MARTINEZ vs RUBEN GARCIA MATA, Jr
May 13, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | PPS Parenting Plan/Child Support | 24-3-00019-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of JOSE ALFREDO ZARATE ESPINOSA and Daniela Denise Oseguera
Jun 10, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | DIC Dissolution of Marriage with Children | 24-3-00023-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of Jerry Carlson and Rosa Carlson
Jun 10, 2024 | DIN Dissolution of Marriage with No Children | 24-3-00024-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of JACOB ALFONSO HERNANDEZ and KRYSTAL M HOFSTEE-HERNANDEZ
Apr 15, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | DIC Dissolution of Marriage with Children | 24-3-00013-01

Case

In Re the Marriage of Chris Eckelbarger and Denise Eckelbarger
May 08, 2024 | Palubicki, K Peter | DIN Dissolution of Marriage with No Children | 24-3-00018-01

Case

Estate of Ray Allen Rice
Jun 26, 2024 | EST Estate | 24-4-00013-01

Document

DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF GEORGIA VS DEKALB COUNTY TAX ASSESSORS
Jul 01, 2024 | Lake, Brian E | Tax Assessor | 24CV6361

Document

In Re the Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed to:C.
Jul 08, 2024 | TP - Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed | 45C01-2407-TP-000479

Document

STEPHANIE JOHNSON V DEONTE FONDA ET AL (E-CASE)
Jul 09, 2024 | CC Tax Action Other | CC Tax Action Other | 24PE-CC00246

Document

SAVITZ, SEAN I vs. HARRIS CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Jul 10, 2024 | KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS | Tax Appraisal | Tax Appraisal | 202443154

Document

City Of Middletown v. Board Of Assessment Review, Assessor Of The Town Of Mount Hope, Town Of Mount Hope
Jul 12, 2024 | E Loren Williams | Real Property - Tax Certiorari | Real Property - Tax Certiorari | EF005655-2024

Document

S/O VS KLINCK ENTERPRISES INC
Jul 11, 2024 | ACTIVATION OF CASE | G-4801-LN-0202408479-000

Document

In Re the Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed to:Timothy J Bryant
Jul 12, 2024 | TP - Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed | 72C01-2407-TP-000030

Document

In Re the Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed to:C.
Jul 08, 2024 | TP - Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed | 45C01-2407-TP-000487

Document

Ohio Department of Taxation vs. CMS TRAINING INSTITUTE, LLC DMR
Jul 11, 2024 | RASTATTER, DOUGLAS M | T DEPARTAMENT OF TAXATION SALES TAX | T DEPARTAMENT OF TAXATION SALES TAX | 24SJ1382

Document

IN THE MATTER OF DELINQUENT LAND TAX vs. AFFOLTER, KAY DGP
Jul 09, 2024 | PADDEN, DANIEL G | DELINQUENT LAND TAX FORECLOSURE | CIVIL | 24CV000314

Document

In Re the Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed to:N.
Jul 11, 2024 | TP - Verified Petition for Issuance of a Tax Deed | 68C01-2407-TP-000573