Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stegman, Stephanie, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2022 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CONFIRMING SALE | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF SALE | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER CONFIRMING SALE | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORT OF SALE | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.