Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcintire, Justin Wayne, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Mcintire, Brooke Donnell, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISS | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.