Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Office Of Child Support Enforcement, filed a(n) Ss - Support - Ocse case against Bowers, Maya Patence Mansari, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2022 |
CategorySs - Support - Ocse |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
June 04, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.