Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hart, Josephine Linker, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Snyder, Douglas Paul, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2023 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
January 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.