Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Linderman, Tammie Suzette, in the jurisdiction of Stone County, AR, . Stone County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStone County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GARNISHMENT RELEASED | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.