Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
9Th West Circuit Division 2 filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case in the jurisdiction of Pike County, AR, . Pike County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2015 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPike County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED | |
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | MOD SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.