Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lecroy, April, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case against Lecroy, Edmond, Mccauley, John, in the jurisdiction of Hot Spring County, AR, . Hot Spring County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2022 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationHot Spring County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCEPT APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPT ADMINISTRATOR/IX | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FEE PROBATE 21-6-413 $ | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | EFILING ADD PARTIES | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.