Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stone, Geneva, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Stone, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Hot Spring County, AR, . Hot Spring County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHot Spring County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: DISTRICT JUDGE OF HOT SPRING CO |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONSOLIDATE | |
January 18, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: DISTRICT JUDGE OF HOT SPRING CO |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROTECT HEARING SCHED | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION CONTINUANCE | |
January 06, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING
Judge: unassigned |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN CONTINUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.